07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
05.08.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
13.08.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.05.2003 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
06.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.04.2003 |
First examination report |
|
11.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
24.01.2003 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
15.11.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
11.11.2002 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
27.09.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
09.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.02.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
25.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |