Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000296925 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1043253 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2004 | B1 | EP1043253 | 10.04.2002 | A3 | EP1043253 | 11.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2304098 | 09.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60014224T | 06.10.2005 | T2 | DE60014224D1 | 04.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW462948B | 11.11.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6367795 | 09.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP10200299 | 09.04.1999 |