EP1043253 - Paper feed apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFU LIMITED Nu-98-2, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states PFU LIMITED Nu-98-2, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Yasuhiro, c/o PFU Limited 98-2, Nu, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun, Ishikawa, 929-1192 / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiyama, Yoshiki, c/o PFU Limited 98-2, Nu, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun, Ishikawa, 929-1192 / JP | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Panten, Kirsten, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Panten, Kirsten, et al Reichel & Reichel, Patentanwälte, Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107520.9 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990102002 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10200299 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043253 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043253 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043253 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/06, B65H3/52 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B65H3/5238 (EP,US);
B65H3/063 (EP,US);
B65H2403/481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Papierzuführvorrichtung | [2000/41] | English: | Paper feed apparatus | [2000/41] | French: | Appareil d'alimentation de papier | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 11.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.09.2004 | GB | 07.04.2005 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 07.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS59186839 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * figure - * [A] ; | [Y]JPH09255167 (DAIWA SEIKO INC) [Y] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4674737 (MURAYOSHI SEIJI [JP]) [Y] 3,5 * column 17, line 19 - line 43; figures 9,11 *; | [Y]FR2673615 (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [Y] 3 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4568074 (MURAYOSHI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 2,4,5,9 * column 20, line 63 - column 21, line 42; figures 5,6,24,31 *; | [YA]JPS5931229 ; | [A]EP0280210 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 9,12,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH107266 ; | [E]JP2000143001 (PFU LTD) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840614), vol. 008, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 302), & JP59031229 A 19840220 (CANON KK) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 11,13 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10007266 A 19980113 (OKI INF SYST;OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * |