EP1043792 - Device for converting energy with at least one fuel cell and/or one hydrolyser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILLER-GmbH Abgunst 24 37520 Osterode am Harz / DE | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruthrof, Klaus Mühlenstrasse 4 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
Sachs, Klaus Quellenweg 26 37520 Osterode / DE | 03 /
Gosebruch, Harald, Dr. Bürgermeister-Urban-Strasse 1 27283 Verden / DE | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107636.3 | 08.04.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | DE1999116243 | 10.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19916243 | [2000/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043792 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043792 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/18 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
H02K11/0094 (EP);
H01M16/00 (EP);
H01M8/00 (EP);
H01M8/04902 (EP);
H02K31/04 (EP);
H01M8/04298 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Energieumwandlung mit mindestens einer Brennstoffzelle und/oder einem Hydrolyseur | [2000/41] | English: | Device for converting energy with at least one fuel cell and/or one hydrolyser | [2000/41] | French: | Dispositif pour la conversion d'énergie avec au moins une pile à combustible et/ou un hydrolyseur | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5532573 (BROWN DONALD W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * column 1, line 20 - column 1, line 25 * * column 2, line 57 - column 6, line 44; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [XY]US5678647 (WOLFE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * column 1, line 19 - column 1, line 26 * * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 67; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [A]SU1835582 ; | [A]RU2074482 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 25, Database accession no. 1994-207932, XP002159739 & SU1809505 A 19930415 (ZABAK O P) [Y] 5,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 10, Database accession no. 1995-073979, XP002092119 & SU1835582 A 19930823 (ZABAK O P) [A] 5,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 40, Database accession no. 1997-433733, XP002159738 & RU2074482 C 19970227 (ZABAK O P) [A] 5,8 * abstract * |