EP1045508 - Lead formation in undulated coils for dynamo-electric machine stator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOP S.p.A. Strada S. Appiano, 8/A 50021 Barberino Val d'Elsa (Firenze) / IT | [2006/22] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states PAVESI S.r.l. Via Biella 60/62 10090 Cascine Vica (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonaccorsi, Andrea Corso Laghi, 51/3 10051 Avigliana (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Stratico, Gianfranco Via Antonio Lombardi 32 53100 Siena / IT | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00107852.6 | 12.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | US19990129094P | 13.04.1999 Original published format: US 129094 P | US20000546195 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: US 546195 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1045508 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1045508 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045508 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/04 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H02K15/0485 (EP,US);
H02K15/0056 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Anschlussleitungen in Wellenförmigen Spulen für Statoren von dynamoelektrischen Maschinen | [2000/42] | English: | Lead formation in undulated coils for dynamo-electric machine stator | [2000/42] | French: | Formation des connexions dans des bobines ondulées pour stator de machine dynamoélectrique | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | IE | 12.04.2006 | LU | 12.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
LU | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4512376 (BARRERA GIORGIO [IT]) [AD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0818874 (POLYTOOL SRL [IT]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 12 - line 31 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5845392 (CARDINI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1-26* column 1, line 32 - line 40; figures 2,3 * |