EP1050553 - Crosslinking agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fink, Peter, Dr. Wiesenweg 5 84561 Mehring / DE | 02 /
Jerschow, Peter, Dr. Heiligkreuz 16 84489 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Schreiter, Hedwig Laufner Strasse 25 84529 Tittmoning / DE | 04 /
Birneder, Richard Posthalterstrasse 28 84359 Simbach / DE | 05 /
Riedl, Alois Unghauser Strasse 30 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108026.6 | 20.04.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | DE1999120954 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920954 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050553 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/12, C08L83/04, C08K5/5419 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08K5/56 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/56, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/30] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vernetzer | [2000/45] | English: | Crosslinking agent | [2000/45] | French: | Agent de réticulation | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 20.04.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/19] | 07.12.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4332425 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 * * page 3, line 59 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 8 - line 19 * * page 8, line 6 - line 7 *; | [A]US5446185 (COBB VICKY S [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0251435 (DOW CORNING [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 7 - line 30 *; | [A]EP0568318 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 19 - line 30 * * page 4; example 2 *; | [A]WO9709370 (RAYCHEM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 8 *; | [A]DE2041633 (DOW CORNING, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,5 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1 * |