EP1033822 - Antenna system for dual mode satellite/cellular portable phone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. One Triangle Park, P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassan, Amer 12633 NE 107 th Place Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
Reinhold, Stanley L. 911 Mill Grove Drive Norristown, PA 19403 / US | 03 /
Hayes, Gerard James 209 Lilliput Lane Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | 04 /
MacDonald, James D., Jr. 134 Parkcrest Drive Apex, NC 27502 / US | 05 /
Ma, Yawei 2300 Van Dyke Avenue Raleigh, NC 27607 / US | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/36] | 01 /
Hassan, Amer 412 Key West Mews Cary, NC 27513 / US | ||
02 /
Reinhold, Stanley L. 1119 Tanglewood Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | |||
03 /
Hayes, Gerard James 207 Abercrombie Road Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | |||
04 /
MacDonald, James D., Jr. 134 Parkcrest Drive Apex, NC 27502 / US | |||
05 /
Ma, Yawei 2300 Van Dyke Avenue Raleigh, NC 27607 / US | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00108094.4 | 15.01.1997 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | US19960586433 | 16.01.1996 Original published format: US 586433 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033822 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033822 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H01Q1/24 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
H04B1/005 (EP);
H01Q1/24 (KR);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/244 (EP);
H04B1/3833 (EP);
H04B1/406 (EP);
H04B1/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antennensystem eines portablen Zweimodusfunktelefon für Satellit/Zellular-Betrieb | [2000/36] | English: | Antenna system for dual mode satellite/cellular portable phone | [2000/36] | French: | Système d'antenne pour un télephone portable à mode satellite et à mode cellulaire | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/07] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97903857.7 / EP0876711 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0508567 (SHAYE COMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,4,11,18-25,32,33,39-42 * abstract *; | [A]WO9309613 (CALLING COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0644607 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-6,9-11,16,18,19,22-25,29-34,39,40 * column A; figures 1,2 * |