EP1046870 - Method for heating and cooling a sorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEO-TECH Zeolith Technologie GmbH Ohmstrasse 3 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states ZEO-TECH Zeolith Technologie GmbH Ohmstrasse 3 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states ZEO-TECH Zeolith Technologie GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 3 D-85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier-Laxhuber, Peter, Dr. Amselweg 16 85386 Dietersheim / DE | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 00108200.7 | 14.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | DE1999117740 | 20.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19917740 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046870 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046870 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B35/04 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
F25B35/04 (EP);
Y02A30/27 (EP);
Y02B30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufheizen und Abkühlen einer Sorberanordnung | [2000/43] | English: | Method for heating and cooling a sorber | [2000/43] | French: | Procédé pour le réchauffement et le refroidissement d'un sorbeur | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19539095 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 47 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2137060 (STUART OTTO, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 1, column R, line 44 - page 5, column L, line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US1944799 (MILLER ERNEST B) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 2, line 10 - page 6, line 56; figures 1-12 *; | [XA]US4637218 (TCHERNEV DIMITER I [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 5, line 40 - column 15, line 68; figures 3-20 * [A] 4,8; | [XA]US5333471 (YAMADA YASUO [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 45 - column 13, line 47; figures 1-13 * [A] 7,8; | [A]DE2801895 (EXXON FRANCE); | [A]EP0131270 (SCHIEDEL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3633465 (NISHIYODO AIR CONDITIONER [JP]) | by applicant | EP0203558 |