EP1047252 - Portable wireless communication equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takebe, Hiroyuki 5-8-20-103, Myoden Ichikawa-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Masao 9-10-10, Asumigaoka, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Kouchi, Itsuki, Raporu Makuharihongo 111 6-13-18, Makuharihongo, Hanamigawa-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108400.3 | 17.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | JP19990112494 | 20.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11249499 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1047252 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1047252 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047252 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04Q7/32 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
H04M1/0202 (EP,US);
H04B7/00 (KR);
H04B1/3805 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M1/725 (EP,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/32] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tragbares schnurloses Kommunikationsgerät | [2000/43] | English: | Portable wireless communication equipment | [2000/43] | French: | Appareil portatif de communication sans fil | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5020090 (MORRIS WALKER C [US]) [A] 3,10,11 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]US5278893 (VOSER BEAT [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2 ** figures 1,6 *; | [Y]EP0629071 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [Y] 3,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0643518 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 1 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5590417 (RYDBECK NILS [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * columns 1-3 * * column 5 * * figures 2,7 * [Y] 3,10,11 |