EP1046775 - Drive unit for a door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novoferm Tormatic GmbH Eisenhüttenweg 6 DE-44145 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Novoferm tormatic GmbH Oberste-Wilms-Str. 15 a 44309 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states tormatic GmbH Oberste-Wilms-Str. 15 a 44309 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginzel, Lothar Am Hermannsbrunnen 26 58239 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
Theile, Ulrich Rehbecke 19 58091 Hagen / DE | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 00108408.6 | 17.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2001/31] |
Former [2000/43] | DE1999118414 | 23.04.1999 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046775 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046775 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046775 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/39, G05B19/416, E05F15/10 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
H02K11/21 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
H02K5/225 (EP);
H02K7/1166 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | E05F15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für ein Tor | [2000/43] | English: | Drive unit for a door | [2000/43] | French: | Unité d'entraînement pour une porte | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 25.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | IT | 22.09.2010 | NL | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | AT | 17.04.2011 | GB | 17.04.2011 | LU | 17.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | FR | 02.05.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
AT | 17.04.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
LU | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
AT | 17.04.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | DK | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | FI | 22.09.2010 | |
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 22.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4558591 (FRANCIS JOHN H [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 21-50; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5371460 (COFFMAN MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 5-38; figures 1-5 ** column 5, lines 14-40 *; | [Y]EP0677475 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19523210 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,2 * column 7, lines 42-46,50; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 9-14 * * column 3, line 9 * * column 8, lines 12-39; figure 2 * * column 7, line 14; figure 2 * * column 1, lines 55-61; figures 1,2 * * column 3, lines 8-52 * * column 5, lines 46-52 *; | [Y]DE19750304 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, lines 3-42; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0500984 |