EP1048279 - Breathable disposable absorbent articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Quality Products, Inc. 80 Cuttermill Road Great Neck New York 11021 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states First Quality Products, Inc. 80 Cuttermill Road Great Neck, New York 11021 / US | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states First Quality Enterprises, Inc. Clinton County Industrial Park, North Road McElhattan, Pennsylvania 17748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karami, Hamzeh P.O. Box 252 McElhattan, PA 17748 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108474.8 | 18.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | US19990302335 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: US 302335 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1048279 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1048279 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/56, A61F13/514 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/5644 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/01] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Atmungsaktiver saugfähiger Wegwerfartikel | [2000/44] | English: | Breathable disposable absorbent articles | [2000/44] | French: | Article absorbant jetable perméable à l'air | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0953323 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9925287 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5873868 (NAKAHATA HIROSHI [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0815820 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5690627 (CLEAR SANDRA HINTZ [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5674216 (BUELL KENNETH BARCLAY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9623469 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5681303 (MILLS SUE ANN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |