EP1127996 - Structure with automatic locking mechanism for awnings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | Structure and automatic locking mechanism for awnings | ||
[2005/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raffl, Kurt Piazza S.Vigilio, 4 39012 Merano (BZ) / IT | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Oberosler, Ludwig Oberosler SAS, Via Dante, 20/A, CP 307 39100 Bolzano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Oberosler, Ludwig Oberosler SAS, Via Dante, 20/A, CP 307 39100 Bolzano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00108611.5 | 20.04.2000 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | IT2000BZ00013 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: IT BZ000013 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1127996 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1127996 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127996 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/06, E06B9/90 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
E04F10/0607 (EP,US);
E04F10/0655 (EP,US);
E06B9/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/25] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Struktur mit automatischem Sperrmechanismus für Markisen | [2005/29] | English: | Structure with automatic locking mechanism for awnings | [2005/29] | French: | Structure avec mécanisme de verouillage automatique pour marquises | [2005/29] |
Former [2001/35] | Struktur und automatischer Sperrmechanismus für Markisen | ||
Former [2001/35] | Structure and automatic locking mechanism for awnings | ||
Former [2001/35] | Structure et mécanisme de verrouillage automatique pour marquises | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | FR | 08.02.2006 | GB | 08.02.2006 | IE | 08.02.2006 | IT | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | LU | 20.04.2006 | BE | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | ES | 19.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
FR | 08.02.2006 | ||
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
LU | 20.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
LU | 20.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
FR | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
LU | 20.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 19.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0957230 (MADO NEDERLAND [NL]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0796976 (SCHMITZ WERKE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0315036 (CLAUSS MARKISEN [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 46 - column 8, line 30; figure 2 * |