EP1046407 - Device for iontophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 408, Tashirodaikanmachi Tosu-shi Saga-ken 841-0017 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO. INC. 408, Tashirodaikanmachi Tosu-shi, Saga-ken 841-0017 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Kazutaka, c/o Tsukuba Lab. of Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc., 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 02 /
Adachi, Hirotoshi, c/o Tsukuba Lab. of Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc., 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Hiroyuki, c/o Tsukuba Lab. of Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc., 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 04 /
Higo, Naruhito, c/o Tsukuba Lab. of Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc., 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Westendorp, Michael Oliver, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Westendorp, Michael, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108731.1 | 22.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | JP19990115993 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11599399 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046407 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046407 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N1/32 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A61N1/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | A61N1/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur iontophoretischen Verabreichung von Medikamenten | [2000/43] | English: | Device for iontophoresis | [2000/43] | French: | Appareil d'ionophorèse | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO9323114 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [XD] 1 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 2 - page 9, line 1; figures 1,3; claim 1 * [Y] 2-6; | [XD]WO8602277 (DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [XD] 1 * page 18, line 14 - page 19, line 19; figures 12-16; claims 3-5 *; | [Y]US4931046 (NEWMAN MARTIN H [US]) [Y] 2,4-6 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 55; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO9610442 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 2,3 * page 9, line 7 - page 9, line 15; figure 3 * * abstract *; | [Y]US5804957 (COLN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 5 * column 2, lines 54-65; claim 8 *; | [Y]WO9707854 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 5; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9711742 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 6; figures 1,3 * * abstract * | by applicant | JPS61100264 | JPH07507951 |