EP1049226 - Connecting device for cableducts lengths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zurecon AG Birmensdorferstrasse 111 8003 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states ZURECON AG Birmensdorferstrasse 111 CH-8003 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egli, Arturo J. Limmatblick 1,Ennetturgi 5300 Turgi / CH | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Rutz, Peter, et al RUTZ & PARTNER Alpenstrasse 14 Postfach 4627 6304 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Rutz, Peter, et al RUTZ & PARTNER Alpenstrasse 14 Postfach 4627 6304 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2006/18] | Luchs, Willi, et al Com Pat AG Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2000/44] | Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt c/o Com Pat AG Gubelstrasse 17 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 00108763.4 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | CH19990000785 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: CH 78599 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1049226 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1049226 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/06 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H02G3/0608 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Kabelkanal-Abschnitten | [2000/44] | English: | Connecting device for cableducts lengths | [2000/44] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour sections de canalisations pour cables | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2006 | 30.04.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2721376 (TOLARTOIS [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 7 - page 3, line 37 * * page 4, line 23 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 9; figures 2,5,6,12 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]DE3606502 (BETTERMANN OBO OHG) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]DE8901613U (NIEDAX GMBH) [Y] 5,6 * page 8, paragraph 1; figure 9 * [A] 7; | [DA]EP0083809 (GEEL NV METAALFAB VAN [NL]) [DA] 1 * figures 1-4 * |