EP1046658 - Monodisperse particles, process for producing the same, and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muranaka, Kazuaki 6-13, Fukukawa 1-chome Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Tsuda, Teruhiko 2-10-102, Ohime-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108800.4 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | JP19990116237 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11623799 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046658 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046658 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/04, C08F265/06 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/29] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Monodisperse Teilchen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [2005/02] | English: | Monodisperse particles, process for producing the same, and uses thereof | [2000/43] | French: | Particules monodispersés, procédé de fabrication et utilisation | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/43] | Monodisperse Teilchen, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendung | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09302004 ; | [Y]EP0326383 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - line 10 * * page 4, line 15 - line 54 * * page 6, line 8 - line 18 * * page 6, line 31 - line 35 * * page 7, line 23 - line 34 * * examples 3,9 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0338486 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 19 - line 27 * * page 5, line 16 - line 34 * * page 6, line 38 - line 48 * * examples 3,4 * * claims 1,3,7 *; | [A]EP0507634 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - line 33 * * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 25 * * page 7, line 57 - page 8, line 9 * * page 8, line 21 - line 42 * * example 1 *; | [A]EP0575143 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * page 4, line 42 - line 48 * * page 5, line 12 - line 17 * * page 5, line 32 - line 37 * * page 5, line 52 - line 58 * * page 6, line 24 - line 30 * * page 6, line 44 - line 54 * * page 12, line 17 - line 24 ** example 7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09302004 A 19971125 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * abstract * |