25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
16.06.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
01.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
24.06.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
24.06.2005 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
24.06.2005 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.11.2004 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
27.10.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.12.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2003 |
First examination report |
|
28.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.09.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
01.06.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
08.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
08.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |