Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4779186B | Global Dossier | 28.09.2011 | B2 | JP2001002716 | 09.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000127634 | 24.04.2000 | JP11623799 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046658 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2005 | B1 | EP1046658 | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP11623799 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60021793T | 20.04.2006 | T2 | DE60021793D1 | 15.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP11623799 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6855761 | 15.02.2005 | B2 | US2002072565 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP11623799 | 23.04.1999 |