EP1102002 - Air-permeable cap and outdoor lamp, automobile lamp and automobile electrical component comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/12] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashiko, Hiroaki, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nishii, Hiroyuki, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Nabata, Norikane, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108849.1 | 26.04.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | JP19990328773 | 18.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32877399 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102002 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102002 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102002 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21V31/03 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
F21S45/37 (EP,US);
B60Q1/02 (KR);
F21S45/33 (EP,US);
F21V31/03 (EP);
H05K5/0213 (US);
H05K5/0216 (EP);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | Lufftdurchlässige Kappe und Aussenleuchte, Kraftfahrzeugleuchte und elektrisches Bauelement für Kraftfahrzeug mit einer solchen Kappe | [2001/21] | English: | Air-permeable cap and outdoor lamp, automobile lamp and automobile electrical component comprising same | [2001/21] | French: | Bouchon perméable à l'air et lampadaire, lampe pour véhicule automobile et composant électrique pour véhicule automobile comprenant un tel bouchon | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.03.2006 | CY | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | LI | 22.03.2006 | IE | 26.04.2006 | LU | 26.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
LU | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4544166 (KARASAWA KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,10-12 * column 2, line 21 - line 34 ** figures 4,5 *; | [X]DE29705538U (ARMATURENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,10-12 * page 1, line 20 - line 34 * * page 2, line 8 - line 35 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0831572 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-12 * column 1, line 20 - line 24 * * column 3, line 32 - line 53 * * column 4, line 2 - line 8 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 1A,1B; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH1085536 |