EP1026632 - image-evaluation system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/32] | IMAGE-EVALUATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2000/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seisma AG Baarer Strasse 12 6300 Zug / CH | [2010/17] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Seisma AG Barer Strasse 12 6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dornier, Claudio Sumpfstrasse 5 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108866.5 | 11.08.1995 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE19944430016 | 24.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4430016 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026632 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026632 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026632 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/10, G06T7/20 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G01V8/10 (EP);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06T7/254 (EP);
G08B13/19602 (EP);
G08B13/19652 (EP);
G08B13/19691 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bildauswertung | [2000/32] | English: | image-evaluation system and method | [2000/36] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION D'IMAGE | [2000/32] |
Former [2000/32] | IMAGE-EVALUATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | Examination procedure | 26.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95929852.2 / EP0777864 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/15] | IE | 28.04.2010 | |
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | IE | 28.04.2010 | |
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | IE | 28.04.2010 | |
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | IE | 28.04.2010 | |
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | GR | 29.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4249207 (HARMAN R KEITH, et al) [X] 1-3,6,11,14-16,19,24 * column 2, line 14 - line 35 *; | [X]FR2538653 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 22 * page 2, line 32 - page 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP0410826 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 11,13,24,26 * column 9, line 34 - line 40 *; | [X]US5099324 (ABE SHOZO [JP]) [X] 19 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 15 *; | [A]US5099322 (GOVE ROBERT J [US]); | [PX]EP0622690 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 22 * figure 9 *; | [PA]DE4332753 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1-3,5,14,15,18 * column 3, line 10 - line 61 * |