EP1078710 - Method and apparatus for determining focus position of a laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xinbing, Liu 3 Breezy Point Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109102.4 | 04.05.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | US19990372121 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: US 372121 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1078710 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1078710 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078710 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/04, B23K26/02 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B23K26/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | B23K26/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erfassen der Lage des Fokuspunktes eines Lasers | [2001/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining focus position of a laser | [2001/09] | French: | Méthode et appareil de détection de la position du point focal d'un laser | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 23.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5670773 (PLANEIX ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 67; figure - * [A] 2-19; | [A]DE3406380 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |