EP1050978 - Satellite communications system with handover processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/45] | Satellite communications system and handover processing method | ||
[2005/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naoko, Yaoya NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109120.6 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | JP19990125446 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12544699 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050978 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050978 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050978 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04B7/18541 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W84/06 (EP,US);
H04W92/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Satelliten Kommunikationsanordnung mit Verfahren zur Verarbeitung des Weiterreichens einer Verbindung. | [2005/04] | English: | Satellite communications system with handover processing method | [2005/04] | French: | Système de communication par satellite avec méthode de traitement de transfert de communication | [2000/45] |
Former [2000/45] | Satelliten Kommunikationsanordnung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von einer Verbindungsübertragung | ||
Former [2000/45] | Satellite communications system and handover processing method | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5561838 (CHANDOS RONALD V [US], et al); | [A]US5761608 (ANDRESEN MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US5826190 (KRUTZ MICHAEL WILLIAM [US], et al) |