EP1052721 - Corrugated waveguide filter having coupled resonator cavities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COM DEV LTD. 155 Sheldon Drive Cambridge Ontario N1R 7H6 / CA | [2010/17] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states COM DEV LTD. 155 Sheldon Drive Cambridge, Ontario N1R 7H6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goulouev, Rousslan 204-B Hespeler Road No. 409 Cambridge, Ontario N1R 3H5 / CA | [2010/17] |
Former [2000/46] | 01 /
Goulouev, Roussian 204-B Hespeler Road No. 409 Cambridge, Ontario N1R 3H5 / CA | Representative(s) | Bradford, Victoria Sophie, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Bradford, Victoria Sophie, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/48] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/22] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Brückner, Raimund (DE) c/o Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue, Hochhaus am Park Grüneburgweg 102 D-60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109183.4 | 08.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | US19990309406 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 309406 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052721 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052721 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052721 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/211 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H01P1/211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Gefaltetes Hohlleiterfilter mit gekoppelten Hohlraumresonatoren | [2000/46] | English: | Corrugated waveguide filter having coupled resonator cavities | [2000/46] | French: | Filtre à guides d' ondes plissé comportant des résonateurs à cavité | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2009 | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Request for further processing for: | 22.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | IE | 08.05.2010 | LU | 08.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 08.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02190001 ; | [A]DE19736367 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,17,30* column 3, lines 4-19; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - W. HAUTH ET AL., "THE CORRUGATED-WAVEGUIDE BAND-PASS FILTER - A NEW TYPE OF WAVEGUIDE FILTER", 18TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE-PROCEEDINGS, STOCKHOLM, (19880912), pages 945 - 949, XP000011123 [A] 1,17,30 * page 945, line 26 - page 946, line 11; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901011), vol. 14, no. 467, Database accession no. (E - 989), & JP02190001 A 19900726 (NEC CORP.) [A] 1,17,30 * abstract * | Examination | US3597710 | WO0055937 | US6232853 | by applicant | US3597710 |