EP1150058 - Insulation element for a pipe elbow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/44] | Insulation element for a pipe elbow and a pipe tee | ||
[2003/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armacell Enterprise GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 10 48153 Münster / DE | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Deutsche Bank AG London Winchester House, 1 Great Winchester Street London EC2N 2DB / GB | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Armacell Enterprise GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 10 48153 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karl, Reinhard Lindenberger Strasse 11 88171 Weiler / DE | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109273.3 | 28.04.2000 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150058 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150058 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/10, F16L59/22 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
F16L59/11 (EP);
F16L59/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | Isolierstück für einen Rohrbogen | [2003/15] | English: | Insulation element for a pipe elbow | [2003/15] | French: | Elément d'isolation pour un tuyau coudé | [2003/15] |
Former [2001/44] | Isolierstück für einen Rohrbogen und für ein Rohr-T-Stück | ||
Former [2001/44] | Insulation element for a pipe elbow and a pipe tee | ||
Former [2001/44] | Elément d'isolation pour un tuyau coudé et pour un raccord de tuyaux en T | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 24.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2003 | FI | 01.10.2003 | IE | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | AT | 28.04.2004 | LU | 28.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 01.10.2003 | |
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2041278 (SYNTEXILL) [A] 1 * page 2, line 8 - line 21 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB1397477 (MULLENDER G) [A] 1* figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE2802470 (RUOFF SCHAEFER RUDOLF) [A] 1-7 * claims 3-5,8-11 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,4,5,7 *; | [XA]EP0546874 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 6, line 8 - line 32 * * column 8, line 1 - line 13 * * claims 4-6 * * figures 3,4,7A,7B * [A] 3-5 |