EP1106064 - Sheetlike plastic horseshoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERA Handelsgesellschaft mbH Am Bärenwald 4 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rafeld, Karl Fronschwenden 77 87499 Wildpoldsried / DE | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Kern, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte KERN, VOLPERT & KOLLEGEN Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109538.9 | 04.05.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | DE1999221225U | 02.12.1999 Original published format: DE 29921225 U | DE2000204928U | 17.03.2000 Original published format: DE 20004928 U | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106064 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106064 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01L5/00 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A01L5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | Hufeisenartiger, plattenförmiger Hufbeschlag aus Kunststoff | [2001/24] | English: | Sheetlike plastic horseshoe | [2001/24] | French: | Fer à cheval en matière plastique en forme de plaque | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | CY | 04.05.2003 | LU | 04.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | [2016/08] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 04.05.2003 | ||
LU | 04.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 04.05.2003 | ||
LU | 04.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
CY | 04.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE533729 (IMPERATOR HESTESKO A S) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB358446 (IMPERATOR HESTESKO AS) [Y] 1-5,11,14,16-19,22 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1163379 (LITTLE ROBERT GEORGE [AU]) [A] 19-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US3494422 (CLARK FRANK M) [A] 27,28* figures 1-8 *; | [YA]US5002132 (FOX ALFRED E [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,11,14,16-19,22 * column W * [A] 20,21,23-26 | by applicant | EP0893057 |