Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3442717B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2003 | B2 | JP2001020005 | 23.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | JP2000126133 | 26.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010049329 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3025200 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1050589 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2307422 | 06.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1219891C | 21.09.2005 | C | CN1273277 | 15.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20001469 | 12.09.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ504325 | 28.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW581816B | 01.04.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6296479 | 02.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP12633099 | 06.05.1999 |