Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
27.08.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
27.08.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
22.07.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.07.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.05.2003 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
03.05.2003 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
25.04.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] |
09.08.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
09.08.2002 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
04.06.2002 | Renewal fee | |
13.10.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |