EP1055866 - Motor vehicle lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enders, Martin Säckingenstrasse 3 81545 München / DE | [2000/48] | Application number, filing date | 00109685.8 | 06.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | DE1999123919 | 26.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923919 | [2000/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055866 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055866 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V8/00, B60Q1/30, B60Q1/26, B60Q1/44 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B60Q1/302 (EP,US);
F21S41/173 (EP,US);
F21S43/237 (EP,US);
F21S43/241 (EP,US);
F21S43/243 (EP,US);
F21S43/247 (EP,US);
F21V25/00 (EP,US);
F21V23/02 (EP,US);
F21W2103/00 (US);
F21W2103/35 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | F21S8/10, F21V8/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/24] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugleuchte | [2000/48] | English: | Motor vehicle lamp | [2000/48] | French: | Feu pour véhicule automobile | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.05.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5347435 (SMITH RONALD T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 1, lines 52-64 - column 2, lines 43-56 * * column 3, lines 29-33 - column 4, lines 28-39; figures 1A,10,11A *; | [X]US5165772 (WU WEI-YU [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, lines 28-30 - column 3, lines 29-47 * * column 5, lines 49-68; figures 1,2,6 *; | [X]US5711592 (HOTTA YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, lines 40-66 - column 4, lines 44-56; figures 1,5 *; | [X]DE4427606 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * Beschreibung, Abbildung *; | [X]EP0495685 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, lines 7-55 - column 7, lines 19-25; figures 4,5; claim 1 * |