EP1053958 - Cellular rotary valve with excentrically adjustable bearing in the side cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTAN Materials Handling GmbH Birkenweg 12 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2002/36] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Motan-Fuller Verfahrenstechnik GmbH Birkenweg 12 88250 Weingarten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heep, Dieter Gartenstrasse 34 88368 Bergatreute / DE | 02 /
Heep, Michael Kuonstrasse 13 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109771.6 | 09.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | DE19991023142 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923142 | [2000/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053958 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053958 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/46 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B65G53/4633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/32] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zellenradschleuse mit exzentrisch einstellbarem Zellenradlager im Seitendeckel | [2000/47] | English: | Cellular rotary valve with excentrically adjustable bearing in the side cover | [2000/47] | French: | Vanne à roue cellulaire avec palier de réglage excentrique dans le couvercle latéral | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.11.2004 | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE3940670 (WAESCHLE MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH) [DX] 1,3,4,10,17,18 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE4033011 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [DX] 1,3,4,10,17 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3940670 | DE4033011 | DE19804431 |