EP1059076 - Use of gasified solid particles for hair treatments and hair treatment compositions containing such particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/50] | Preparation of an instant gel and the use of gaseous solid particles for cosmetic treatments | ||
[2006/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birkel, Susanne, Dr. Vösendorfring 36 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 02 /
Wendel, Harald Grabengasse 3 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 03 /
Steinbrecht, Karin, Dr. Steinbruchweg 15 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 04 /
Maurer, Wolfgang, Dr. Eichenweg 23 69198 Schriesheim / DE | [2000/50] | Application number, filing date | 00109775.7 | 09.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE2000119313 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10019313 | DE1999126316 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926316 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059076 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059076 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059076 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/11, A61K8/19, A61K8/60, A61K8/81, A61K8/896, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/04, A61Q5/06, A61Q19/10 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K2800/22 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/50] | A61K7/00, A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Verwendung von festen, gasifizierten Teilchen für Haarbehandlungen und diese enthaltendes Haarbehandlungsmittel | [2006/26] | English: | Use of gasified solid particles for hair treatments and hair treatment compositions containing such particles | [2006/26] | French: | Utilisation de particules solides gazifiées pour les traitments des cheveux et compositions capillaires les contenant | [2006/26] |
Former [2000/50] | Instantgel-Zubereitung und Verwendung von festen, gasifizierten Teilchen für kosmetische Behandlungen | ||
Former [2000/50] | Preparation of an instant gel and the use of gaseous solid particles for cosmetic treatments | ||
Former [2000/50] | Préparation d'un gel instantané et utilisation de particules solides gazifiées pour des traitments cosmétiques | Examination procedure | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05022016.9 / EP1616555 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.10.2006 | FI | 25.10.2006 | IE | 25.10.2006 | IT | 25.10.2006 | NL | 25.10.2006 | DK | 25.01.2007 | SE | 25.01.2007 | GR | 26.01.2007 | ES | 05.02.2007 | PT | 26.03.2007 | AT | 09.05.2007 | LU | 09.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/39] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 09.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 25.10.2006 | |
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 25.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6239602 ; | [X]JPH02121917 ; | [X]JPH0240319 ; | [A]FR1195918 (S PIERRE-FRANCOIS-JOSE) [A] 1-24* claim - *; | [X]US2971292 (G.J.MALECKI) [X] 13,15 * page 2, line 32 - line 37 * * column 5, line 72 - line 75 * * claims 1,2,5,6,12 *; | [X]GB2050410 (MANN & SCHROEDER KG) [X] 1,3,7,20 * page 1, line 24 - line 37 * * page 1, line 56 - line 58 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0129197 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12,20 * page 6, line 16 - line 17 * * claim - *; | [A]FR2738148 (CODIF INTERNATIONAL SA [FR]) [A] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2753097 (BARRAU FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 13,16,17,20-23 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 4, paragraphs 3-6 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-6,12,16,18-20 *; | [AX]US5824629 (PETRITSCH ERICH [AT]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 66 - line 67 * * column 3, line 13 - line 15 * * column 3, line 37 - line 42 * * column 4, line 28 - line 33 * * column 6, line 32 - line 38 * * claim - * [X] 20; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 13, Database accession no. 1987-089900, XP002231144 & JPS6239602 A 19870220 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-3,7,9,20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900718), vol. 014, no. 334, Database accession no. (C - 0742), & JP02121917 A 19900509 (LION CORP) [X] 1,3,7,9,20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900423), vol. 014, no. 197, Database accession no. (C - 0712), & JP02040319 A 19900209 (TADAO SHIRAISHI) [X] 1,3,7,9,20 * abstract * |