EP1052038 - Punching machine of section bars for roller shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Change - designated states | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | 21.03.2003 | Change - request for examination | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecno System S.r.l. Via Mazzini, 49 44015 Portomaggiore (Ferrara) / IT | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mantovani, Daniele Via Nazionale 188 Benvignante di Argenta (Ferrara) / IT | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 00109868.0 | 10.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00247 | 11.05.1999 Original published format: IT BO990247 | [2000/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052038 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052038 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/24, B21D43/02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B26D5/22 (EP);
B21D28/243 (EP);
B21D43/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/19] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stanzmaschine für Rolladenprofile | [2000/46] | English: | Punching machine of section bars for roller shutter | [2000/46] | French: | Presse à poinçonnage pour des profilés d'un volet roulant | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE823284 (CHARLES JOSEPH RHODES) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,7,9 *; | [A]US3322011 (KOCIAN GEORGE J) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]US3892154 (DUFFY MARCUS L) [A] 1,2* figure 1 *; | [A]US5199339 (CREECH CLYDE W [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * |