14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
04.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
08.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
07.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
23.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
17.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
25.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.08.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] |
13.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.05.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.10.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
22.06.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] |
11.05.2001 |
First examination report |
|
08.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.04.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
06.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |