Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001006814 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1054477 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2003 | B1 | EP1054477 | 22.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE255775T | 15.12.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0003726 | 13.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19923386 | 18.01.2001 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60006894D1 | 15.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6811422 | 02.11.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923386 | 21.05.1999 |