EP1054477 - Electrical plug connector particularly for automotive applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [2003/40] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Klaus Kirchberg 2 91483 Oberscheinfeld / DE | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110247.4 | 19.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | DE19991023386 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923386 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054477 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054477 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/625 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
H01R13/625 (EP,US);
H01R13/62933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | Elekrischer Steckverbinder, insbesondere für Anwendungen in Kraftfahrzeugen | [2000/47] | English: | Electrical plug connector particularly for automotive applications | [2000/47] | French: | Connecteur électrique à douille, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2003 | BE | 03.12.2003 | CH | 03.12.2003 | CY | 03.12.2003 | FI | 03.12.2003 | LI | 03.12.2003 | NL | 03.12.2003 | DK | 03.03.2004 | GR | 03.03.2004 | SE | 03.03.2004 | DE | 04.03.2004 | ES | 14.03.2004 | PT | 03.05.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | LU | 19.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
CY | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 03.12.2003 | ||
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
CH | 03.12.2003 | ||
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
FI | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 03.12.2003 | |
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3248154 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0512323 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5662488 (ALDEN PETER H [US]) [X] 1* abstract * |