EP1054041 - Brilliant yellow dyes containing a fluorotriazine group, process for their preparation and their use for dyeing materials containing hydroxy- and amido-groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Eschenheimer Tor 2 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannheim, Jörg, Dr. Stubbergstrasse 32 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/47] | Application number, filing date | 00110338.1 | 13.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | DE1999122825 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19922825 | [2000/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054041 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/085, C09B62/51, // D06P3/66 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C09B62/4413 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | Neue fluortriazinhaltige brillantgelbe Farbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zum Färben von hydroxy- und amidgruppenhaltigen Materialien | [2000/47] | English: | Brilliant yellow dyes containing a fluorotriazine group, process for their preparation and their use for dyeing materials containing hydroxy- and amido-groups | [2000/47] | French: | Colorants jaunes brillants contenant un groupe fluorotriazine, procédé pour leurs préparations et leurs utilisations pour la teinture de matériaux contenant des groupes hydroxyles et amides | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2026527 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-7,9 *Tabelle 2, Verbindung 9; Tabelle 6, Verbindung 5 *; | [X]JPS59155465 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * Beispiel 5; Seite 8, Tabelle *; | [DX]EP0085654 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9 * Beispiel 1; Tabelle II, Verbindungen 8, 61, 64 *; | [DX]EP0085025 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DX] 1-3,7,9 * Tabelle I, Verbindung 103 *; | [A]JPS5692961 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-9 * Verbindungen 5, 6 * | [ ] - "Fiber-reactive monoazo dyes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850128), vol. 102, no. 4, Database accession no. 26368a, page 94 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - "Reactive azo dyes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19811214), vol. 95, no. 24, Database accession no. 205410s, page 75 [ ] * abstract * |