EP1054238 - Method and apparatus for detecting position using phase-shifted signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amiteq Co., Ltd. Hashikan LK Building 1-6 Azuma-cho Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 192-0082 / JP | [2014/24] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Goto, Atsutoshi Shinmachi 1-77-2 Fuchu-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Atsutoshi Shinmachi 1-77-2 Fuchu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Kazuya Room No. 405 Kawasaki 1-1-5 Hamura-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Akatsu, Nobuyuki Niibori 2-1453-43 Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2017/28] |
Former [2000/47] | 01 /
Goto, Atsutoshi Shinmachi 1-77-2 Fuchu-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamoto, Kazuya Room No. 405, Kawasaki 1-1-5 Hamura-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Akatsu, Nobuyuki Niibori 2-1453-43 Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [2017/28] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/47] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110444.7 | 16.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | JP19990139242 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13924299 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1054238 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1054238 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054238 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20, G01D5/243 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G01D5/204 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | G01D5/243 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/28] |
Former [2002/51] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Messung der Position unter Verwendung von phasenverschobenen Signalen | [2000/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting position using phase-shifted signals | [2000/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil de détection de données positionelles utilisant de signaux décalés | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5710509 (GOTO ATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,8,11,13,15-22* the whole document * |