EP1059129 - Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack and forming tool used therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/50] | Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack, forming tool used therein and two chamber pressure pack produced therewith | ||
[2002/29] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LECHNER GmbH - Fabrik für Aluminiumverpackungen Max-Eyth-Str. 8-10 D-78239 Rielasingen-Worblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states LECHNER GmbH, Fabrik für Aluminium-Verpackungen Max-Eyth-Str. 8-10 D-78239 Rielasingen-Worblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Konrad Hauptstrasse 45a 78269 Volkertshausen / DE | 02 /
Wunsch, Peter Brommenstrasse 11 78343 Horn / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Kastel, Stefan, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Kastel, Stefan Dipl.-Phys., et al Flügel, Preissner & Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/50] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lesser, Flügel & Kastel, Wissmannstrasse 14 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110460.3 | 16.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE1999126496 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926496 | DE1999132680 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932680 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059129 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059129 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/24, B21D51/26, B65D83/14 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B21D15/03 (EP);
B21D51/24 (EP);
B21D51/2646 (EP);
B65D83/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Zweikammerdruckpackung und Bearbeitungswerkzeug zur Verwendung darin | [2002/29] | English: | Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack and forming tool used therein | [2002/29] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication d' une bombe à aérosol comportant deux chambres et outil de formage utilisé dans cette méthode et ce dispositif | [2002/29] |
Former [2000/50] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Zweikammerdruckpackung, Bearbeitungswerkzeug zur Verwendung darin sowie damit herstellbare Zweikammerdruckpackung | ||
Former [2000/50] | Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack, forming tool used therein and two chamber pressure pack produced therewith | ||
Former [2000/50] | Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication d' une bombe à aérosol comportant deux chambres, outil de formage utilisé dans cette méthode et ce dispositif et bombe à aérosol ainsi fabriquée | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US5069590 (STOFFEL GERD [DE]) [YD] 12-16 * column W * [A] 1,17; | [Y]DE2103447 (PRESSPACK) [Y] 12-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US3979025 (FRIEDRICH RICHARD, et al) |