EP1055471 - Bar feeding device for machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CUCCHI GIOVANNI & C. S.r.l. Via Genova, 4 I-20060 Bussero Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states CUCCHI GIOVANNI & C. S.r.l. Via Genova, 4 I-20060 Bussero Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cucchi, Giovanni Via Genova 4 20060 Bussero (MI) / IT | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Coloberti, Luigi Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Via De Amicis, 25 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Coloberti, Luigi Via E. de Amicis No. 25 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00110598.0 | 18.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01167 | 26.05.1999 Original published format: IT MI991167 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055471 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B23B13/02 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
B23B13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/33] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stangenzuführvorrichtung für Werkzeugmaschinen | [2000/48] | English: | Bar feeding device for machine tools | [2000/48] | French: | Embarreur pour machines outils | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.07.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5066185 (CUCCHI GIOVANNI [IT]) [AD] 1 * abstract * |