EP1061007 - Actuator cap for aerosol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSOL-TECHNIK LINDAL GMBH Industriestrasse 13 D-23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lilienthal, Hans Peter Wulfsdal 35 22587 Hamburg / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110873.7 | 23.05.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999125887 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19925887 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061007 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/22 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B65D83/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Abgabekopf für einen mit einem Ventil versehenen Druckbehälter | [2000/51] | English: | Actuator cap for aerosol | [2000/51] | French: | Tête de distribution pour aérosol | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]DE29920994U (LINDAL GMBH AEROSOL TECH [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5971214 (BETTISON JR WILLIAM L [VE]) [PA] 1 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 12; figures 22,23 * |