EP1058087 - Position recording of an edge with distributed sensors by determining the turning point [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERHARDT + LEIMER GmbH Leitershofer Strasse 80 D-86157 Augsburg / DE | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Gerhard Wiesenweg 4 86507 Kleinaitingen / DE | 02 /
Brunner, Gerhard Jägerbachstrasse 4 86179 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Häussler, Harald Föhrenweg 12 86169 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
Seibold, Hans Herlestrasse 16 86420 Anhausen / DE | 05 /
Schwarz, Norbert Burgfriedenstrasse 15a 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2003/25] |
Former [2000/49] | 01 /
Alt, Gerhard Wiesenweg 4 86507 Kleinaitingen / DE | ||
02 /
Brunner, Gerhard Jägerbachstrasse 4 86179 Augsburg / DE | |||
03 /
Häussler, Harald Föhrenweg 12 86169 Augsburg / DE | |||
04 /
Seibold, Hans Herlestrasse 16 86420 Anhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Witzany, Manfred Patentanwalt Falkenstrasse 4 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Witzany, Manfred Patentanwalt Falkenstrasse 4 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2000/49] | Sasse, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al Parreutstrasse 27 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110943.8 | 25.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | DE1999124798 | 29.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19924798 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058087 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058087 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01D5/34, B65H23/02 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G01B11/028 (EP,US);
B65H23/0204 (EP,US);
B65H2553/10 (EP,US);
B65H2553/30 (EP,US);
B65H2553/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lageerfassung einer Kante mit verteilten Sensoren durch Wendepunktsbestimmung | [2000/49] | English: | Position recording of an edge with distributed sensors by determining the turning point | [2000/49] | French: | Détermination de la position d'un bord avec des capteurs répartis par la détermination du point tournant | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
04.05.2007
WITHDRAWN BST International GmbH Heidsieker Heide 53 33731 Bielefeld / DE Opponents representative Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
04.05.2007
WITHDRAWN BST International GmbH Heidsieker Heide 53 33731 Bielefeld / DE Opponents representative Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
04.05.2007
WITHDRAWN BST International GmbH Heidsieker Heide 53 33731 Bielefeld / DE Opponents representative Klingseisen, Franz Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
27.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE BST International GmbH Heidsieker Heide 53 33731 Bielefeld / DE Opponents representative Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | 18.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.05.2003 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2003 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 04.06.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.06.2007 | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 01.07.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3907439 (ZANONI CARL A) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3317057 (ERHARDT & LEIMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 15, line 17 - line 22 * * page 17, line 4 - line 10 * * page 18, line 4 - line 10 * * page 19, line 35 - page 20, line 2; figure 9 *; | [AD]DE3423308 (ERHARDT & LEIMER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * page 11, line 11 - line 13 * * page 12, line 1 - line 3 *; | [A]EP0392085 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [A] * page 2, line 20 - line 22 ** page 4, line 41 - line 44; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP0532933 (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 10, line 9 - line 20; figure 8; claim 11 *; | [A]DE4203947 (BST SERVO TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] * column 3, line 48 - line 56; figure 3 *; | [A]DE19500822 (ERHARDT & LEIMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 8, line 9 - line 14; figure 5 * |