EP1091213 - Signal-identifying circuit arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER WETZER GmbH + Co. KG Obere Wank 1 87484 Nesselwang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Wetzer GmbH + Co. KG Obere Wank 1 D-87484 Nesselwang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Dieter Marsstrasse 21 87484 Nesselwang / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Andres, Angelika, et al PatServ-Zentrale Patentabteilung, Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Postfach 2222 79574 Weil/Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Morstadt, Volker Dipl.-Ing. Endress + Hauser(Deutschland) Holding GmbH PatServe-Patentabteilung, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111142.6 | 24.05.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | DE19991048430 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948430 | [2001/23] |
Former [2001/15] | DE19991048430 | 04.10.1999 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091213 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/12, G01R15/09 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
G01D3/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Signal-identifizierende Schaltungsanordnung | [2001/15] | English: | Signal-identifying circuit arrangement | [2001/15] | French: | Circuit identifiant des signaux | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5557197 (SCHULZE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 1 - line 26 * * column 4, line 6 - line 13 * * column 4, line 28 - line 30 * * column 4, line 45 - line 47 ** figure 1 * | Examination | EP0435431 | FR2664380 | EP0487174 | FR2678411 |