EP1158061 - Production of a solid material in parallelepipedal or cylindrical shape, laminated, sintered, cut-up and thermally treated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technodop Ltd. (Société de Droit Irlandais) 15, Anne Street South Dublin 2 / IE | [2001/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen-Adad, Marie-Thérése 43, Chemin des Petites Brosses 69300 Caluire / FR | 02 /
Laversenne, Laetitia 29, rue Challemel Lacour 69007 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Goutaudier, Christelle 8, rue Putet 69250 Fleurieu/Saone / FR | 04 /
Boulon, Georges 13 bis, rue de la Garenne 69005 Lyon / FR | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Gaucherand, Michel IXAS Conseil 15, rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Gaucherand, Michel IXAS Conseil 15 Rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 00111372.9 | 26.05.2000 | [2001/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1158061 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158061 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, B22F3/16, B22F5/12, B32B31/18 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
C22C49/00 (EP,US);
B22F1/062 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP);
C03B32/00 (EP);
C03B37/01291 (EP);
C03B37/01297 (EP);
C04B35/653 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
C03B2201/80 (EP);
C03B2201/84 (EP);
C04B2237/34 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/004, B22F3/14, B22F9/04 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F9/04, C22C49/00 (EP);
B22F2999/00, C22C49/00, B22F2207/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Title | German: | Herstellung eines festes Werkstoffes in quader- oder zylindrischer Form, der laminiert, gesintert, geschnitten und wärmebehandelt wird | [2001/48] | English: | Production of a solid material in parallelepipedal or cylindrical shape, laminated, sintered, cut-up and thermally treated | [2001/48] | French: | Réalisation d'un matériau solide, de forme parallélépipédique ou cylindrique, stratifié, fritté, découpé et traité thermiquement | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | GB | 29.09.2004 | IE | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | DE | 30.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | CY | 26.05.2005 | LU | 26.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DE | 30.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]RU2089347 ; | [X]JPS56155046 ; | [A]GB565520 (CUTANIT, et al) [A] 1,10 * page 2, lignes 43-63 *; | [X]US4217399 (DOBO EMERICK J [US]) [X] 10,11 * abrégé; revendications *; | [X]US5424282 (YAMAMOTO SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 10,11 * revendication 1 *; | [X]EP0870919 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * revendications 1 et 13; figures *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 18, Database accession no. 1998-205532, XP002149221 & RU2089347 C 19970910 (SINELSHCHIKOV V V) [A] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820312), vol. 006, no. 040, Database accession no. (C - 094), & JP56155046 A 19811201 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [X] 12,13 * abstract * | [A] - LIN C -Y ET AL, "EXTRUSION PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF BULK FUNCTIONALLY GRADED MATERIALS", POWDER METALLURGY,GB,METALS SOCIETY. LONDON, (1996), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0032-5899, pages 219 - 222, XP000641583 [A] 1 * page 219 * |