EP1029864 - Process for the purification of a 3-cephem-4-carboxylic acid derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biochemie GesmbH 6250 Kundl / AT | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludescher, Johannes Kleinsöll 101 6252 Breitenbach / AT | 02 /
Prager, Bernhard Mühlbichl 3e 6230 Brixlegg / AT | 03 /
Wolf, Siegfried Brufferstrasse 4 6230 Brixlegg / AT | [2001/06] |
Former [2000/34] | 01 /
Ludescher, Johannes Kleinsöll 101 6252 Breitenbach / AT | ||
02 /
Prager, Bernhard Steinbacherstrasse 1/16 6300 Wörgl / AT | |||
03 /
Wolf, Siegfried Brufferstrasse 4 6230 Brixlegg / AT | Representative(s) | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/34] | Becker, Konrad Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Patent- und Trademark Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 00111498.2 | 21.12.1992 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | AT19920000191 | 05.02.1992 Original published format: AT 19192 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029864 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029864 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/18, C07D501/12 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
C07D501/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von einem 3-Cephem-4- Carbonsäurederivat | [2000/34] | English: | Process for the purification of a 3-cephem-4-carboxylic acid derivative | [2000/34] | French: | Procédé de purification d'un dérivé d'acide 3-céphem-4-carboxylique | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93901714.1 / EP0630380 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2003 | BE | 24.09.2003 | CH | 24.09.2003 | LI | 24.09.2003 | MC | 24.09.2003 | LU | 21.12.2003 | IE | 22.12.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | SE | 24.12.2003 | PT | 24.02.2004 | [2013/21] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LU | 21.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
PT | 24.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LU | 21.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2173798 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4694079 (CRAST JR LEONARD B [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0503453 (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [PA] 1-6* the whole document * |