EP1060669 - Supporting base for transporting and finishing of dough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/51] | Device and method for transporting and finishing of dough | ||
[2004/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. AUGUST OETKER NAHRUNGSMITTEL KG Lutterstrasse 14 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehn, Stefan Carl-Severing-Strasse 186 33649 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Spiegel, Udo Dr. Stralauer Weg 15 33619 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Knoll, Eckhard Filzener Weg 10 54472 Brauneberg / DE | 04 /
Krömmelbein, Volker Salzschlirferstrasse 5 36110 Schlitz / DE | 05 /
Jöckel, Walter In den Bachwiesen 1 36369 Lautertal / DE | 06 /
Reis, Sabine Auf der Harf 5 36304 Alsfeld / DE | 07 /
Greb, Hartmut Schulstrasse 28 36369 Lautertal / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Gerd, et al Mai Rechtsanwälte Rechtsanwälte Lutterstrasse 14 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Meyer, Gerd, et al Meyer & Möbitz Rechtsanwälte Lutterstrasse 14 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111527.8 | 30.05.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999127935 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927935 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1060669 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1060669 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060669 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/13 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
A21B3/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Unterlage zum Transportieren und Fertigstellen von Rohteigen | [2004/49] | English: | Supporting base for transporting and finishing of dough | [2004/49] | French: | Support pour transport et d'achèvement de pâte | [2004/49] |
Former [2000/51] | Material und Vorrichtung zum Transportieren und Fertigstellen von Rohteigen | ||
Former [2000/51] | Device and method for transporting and finishing of dough | ||
Former [2000/51] | Dispositif et méthode de transport et d'achèvement de pâte | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 18.05.2005 | CY | 30.05.2005 | LU | 30.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/26] | IE | 18.05.2005 | |
CY | 30.05.2005 | ||
LU | 30.05.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | IE | 18.05.2005 | |
CY | 30.05.2005 | ||
LU | 18.07.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | IE | 18.05.2005 | |
LU | 18.07.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | IE | 18.05.2005 | |
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | GR | 18.08.2005 | |
PT | 24.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1505999 (GEREKE EDWARD G) [X] 1,2,10,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2027296 (KIMBERLY STUART, et al); | [X]US2051960 (MCCASKELL JASPER A) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0664082 (MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9611576 (BT PAPER PROD AB [SE], et al) |