Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
30.05.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
15.04.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
17.05.2002 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
03.05.2002 | Renewal fee | |
05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
29.11.2001 | Change - extension states | |
13.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant | |
13.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant | |
28.07.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
02.07.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
23.03.2001 | First examination report | |
19.03.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
10.11.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
10.11.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |