EP1063311 - Use of a tin rich copper-tin-iron alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieland-Werke AG 89070 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Wieland-Werke AG 89070 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bögel, Andreas, Dr. Robert-Schumann-Strasse 4b 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | 02 /
Hansmann, Stephan, Dr. Frauenstrasse 52 89073 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Hofmann, Uwe, Dr. Kasernstrasse 25 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2000/52] | Application number, filing date | 00111779.5 | 03.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | DE19991027646 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927646 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063311 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063311 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C22C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer zinnreichen Kupfer-Zinn-Eisen-Legierung | [2000/52] | English: | Use of a tin rich copper-tin-iron alloy | [2000/52] | French: | Utilisation des alliages de cuivre-etain-fer riches en étain | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.07.2002 | IE | 03.07.2002 | NL | 03.07.2002 | DK | 03.10.2002 | PT | 03.10.2002 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/29] | GR | 03.07.2002 | |
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 03.07.2002 | |
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 03.07.2002 | |
NL | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 03.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3655367 (BLEECKER ALBERT B) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,2; table 1 *; | [A]GB1496749 (OLIN CORP) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 40 - line 51 *; | [A]US4116686 (MRAVIC BRIAN, et al) [A] 1-12 * tables I,II,IV *; | [A]GB1542181 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [A] 1-12* page 1, line 54 - line 63 *; | [A] - DR.-ING. KURT DIES, Kupfer und Kupferlegierungen in der Technik, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG/NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, 66292, XP002143689 [A] 1-12 *Seiten 504 bis 513, 537,554,570 bis 576, insbesondere Seiten 513, 554 und 570 bis 573* |