EP1059263 - Selective removing method of carbon monoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5-1, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nojima, Shigeru, Mitsubshi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Yasutake, Toshinobu, Mitsubshi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111826.4 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | JP19990160614 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16061499 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059263 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059263 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/58 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
C01B3/583 (EP,US);
B01D53/864 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selektiven Entfernung von Kohlenmonoxid | [2000/50] | English: | Selective removing method of carbon monoxide | [2000/50] | French: | Procédé pour l'élimination sélective de monoxyde de carbone | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9319005 (INT FUEL CELLS CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0642827 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [PX]EP0955351 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |