EP1077506 - Compact mesh stowage for deployable perimeter truss reflectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. One Space Park Redondo Beach California 90278 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states TRW Inc. One Space Park Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilger, Lloyd D. 2912 Briarwood Drive Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 02 /
Jones, Donald L. 4351 Alla Road No. 8 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111943.7 | 15.06.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | US19990336657 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: US 336657 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077506 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/16, H01Q1/28 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
H01Q1/288 (EP,US);
H01Q15/161 (EP,US);
H01Q15/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kompakte Gitterverstauung für Reflektoren mit einer faltbaren Umfangsfachwerkstruktur | [2001/08] | English: | Compact mesh stowage for deployable perimeter truss reflectors | [2001/08] | French: | Système d'arrimage compact de réflecteurs ayant une structure périmétrique en treillis pliable | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 22.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475323 (SCHWARTZBERG FRED R [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,7 * column 2, line 33 - column 7, line 54 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0290729 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,6,7* abstract *; | [DA]US5680145 (THOMSON MARK W [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,6,7 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 25 * * column 6, line 31 - column 15, line 38 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0807991 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1,4,6,7 * abstract *; | [EPX]EP0959524 (TRW INC [US]) [E] 1,4,6,7 * abstract * [PX] 1,4,6,7; | [PXD]US6028570 (GILGER L DWIGHT [US], et al) [PXD] 1,4,6,7 * abstract * |