EP1197194 - Expanding applicator for a human waste collection bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evangelista, Olindo Via Foro 100/A 66023 Francavilla al Mare, Chieti / IT | 02 /
Spinelli, Ivana Via Colle Scorrano 113 65100 Pescara / IT | 03 /
Sullivan, Ann Marie 129 Lake Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
Sutton, Thomas Viale Brianza 33 20127 Milano / IT | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111979.1 | 10.10.2000 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197194 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/443 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A61F5/443 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ExpandierbarerApplikator für einen Sammelbehälter von menschlichen Fäkalien | [2002/16] | English: | Expanding applicator for a human waste collection bag | [2002/16] | French: | Applicateur expansible pour sac collecteur de déchets humains | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5312384 (TEMPLE JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 38; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]WO0000126 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US3522807 (MILLENBACH BLUMA) [AD] 1 * figure - *; | [AD]JPH08117261 ; | [A]US4445898 (JENSEN MARVIN E [US]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08117261 A 19960514 (BEPPU YOSHIO) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3577989 | US3522807 | US3734096 | US2116849 | JPH08117261 | WO0000126 | EP0613672 |