EP1060840 - Clamping device for clamping workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE-STA-CO Europe GmbH Hiroshimastrasse 2 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2005/40] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states DE-STA-CO Metallerzeugnisse GmbH Industriestrasse 17-23 D-61449 Steinbach/Ts. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schauss, Peter Wiesenring 8 65349 Flörsheim / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Günter Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112191.2 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999210607U | 17.06.1999 Original published format: DE 29910607 U | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1060840 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1060840 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/16 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B25B5/16 (EP);
B25B5/163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung zum Festspannen von Werkstücken | [2000/51] | English: | Clamping device for clamping workpieces | [2000/51] | French: | Dispositif de serrage pour serrer des pièces a travailler | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/35] | 21.04.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29901363U (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 16 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2618713 (CECCHI GERARD [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 29 - line 32; figures 2,5 *; | [A]EP0862970 (SMC KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 10 - line 19; figures 1,2,7-9 * |