EP1059186 - Vehicle-behavior control apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Zensaku c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Nagae, Akira c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112236.5 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | JP19990160895 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16089599 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059186 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059186 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059186 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B60K28/165 (EP);
B60K28/16 (US);
B60W2510/1005 (EP,US);
F16H61/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/48] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des Fahrverhaltens eines Fahrzeuges | [2000/50] | English: | Vehicle-behavior control apparatus and method | [2000/50] | French: | Méthode et appareil de contrôle du comportement d'un véhicule | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275253 (SPERDUTI DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 5, line 66 - column 5, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US5737714 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * column 5, line 22 - column 5, line 30; figures 3,5; claim 1 *; | [A]US5850616 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 4 * | by applicant | JPH08310366 |